This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 12:52:04 (UTC).

KRYSTAL L HARDIN

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 KRYSTAL L HARDIN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK P MERCURIO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********55AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICK P MERCURIO

 

Party Details

Defendants

KRYSTAL L HARDIN

Bradenton, FL 34208

KRYSTAL LYNN HARDIN

Bradenton, FL 34208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MARK R ADAMS

TAHIRAH R PAYNE

THOMAS L BEACH

Other Attorneys

KRISTEN COLELLI

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING ON 09/08/2020 AT 09:30 AM

08/28/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING ON 09/08/2020 AT 09:30 AM

ENTRY OF PLEA OF DENIAL TO PETITION FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION OR COMMUNITY CONTROL AND DEMAND FOR FORMAL HEARING AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

08/17/2020 - ENTRY OF PLEA OF DENIAL TO PETITION FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION OR COMMUNITY CONTROL AND DEMAND FOR FORMAL HEARING AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

08/13/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS WARRANT SERVED

08/13/2020 - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS WARRANT SERVED

ORDER FOR RESTITUTION

03/16/2020 - ORDER FOR RESTITUTION

COMMITMENT - DISPOSITION

03/16/2020 - COMMITMENT - DISPOSITION

ORDER SETTING HEARING / CONTINUANCE - VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING SET FOR 3/16/2020 AT 9:30AM

03/12/2020 - ORDER SETTING HEARING / CONTINUANCE - VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING SET FOR 3/16/2020 AT 9:30AM

INFORMATION FILED

02/07/2020 - INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY TAHIRAH PAYNE, ESQUIRE

02/04/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY TAHIRAH PAYNE, ESQUIRE

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

01/31/2020 - ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

01/30/2020 - MOTION TO WITHDRAW

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

01/30/2020 - MOTION TO WITHDRAW

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/29/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/27/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * COURT REVOKES BOND ON CASE : 2019 CF 3588 - ORDER FILED WITH CLERK * *

01/27/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * COURT REVOKES BOND ON CASE : 2019 CF 3588 - ORDER FILED WITH CLERK * *

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/27/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/27/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNON-IMAGED COST WORKSHEET FILED - REFERRED TO DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY - SEE CASE # 2019CF002857AX FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketVIDEO WAIVER SEE 2019CF2857 FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketVIOLATION OF PROBATION ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS SEE 2019CF2857 FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Hearing09/08/2020 at 09:30AM - VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMMITMENT - DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketREPRESENTED BY THOMAS BEACH, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER STATE REPRESENTED BY KRISTEN COLELLI VIA ZOOM ADMITTED VIOLATION OF PROBATION FOUND GUILTY OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION PROBATION REVOKED SENTENCED TO 11 MONTHS AND 29 DAYS COUNTY JAIL WITH CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED AS OF 8/12/2020 ARREST CONCURRENT WITH 2019CF2857AX SEE COST SHEET FOR MONETARY OBLIGATION THIRTY DAYS TO FILE AN APPEAL JUDGE FREDERICK P MERCURIO ENTERED VIA ICPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Hearing08/28/2020 at 09:00AM - EARLY CASE RESOLUTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING ON 09/08/2020 AT 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS~INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED-SEE CASE # 2019CF2857AX FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF PLEA OF DENIAL TO PETITION FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION OR COMMUNITY CONTROL AND DEMAND FOR FORMAL HEARING AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY TAHIRAH PAYNE, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK) * * COURT REVOKES BOND ON CASE : 2019 CF 3588 - ORDER FILED WITH CLERK * *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.13c; Description: FELONY PETIT THEFT; Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less