This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 13:46:18 (UTC).

KRYSTAL J TRANT

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 KRYSTAL J TRANT was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********46AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Defendants

KRYSTAL J TRANT

Bradenton, FL 34205

KRYSTLE J TRANT

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DAMIEN JOSEPH BYTHROW

JOSEPH CAMPOLI

Other Attorneys

ROBERT ELLIS GAIL

CYNTHIA L PRITCHETT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

08/07/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

MANATEE COUNTY DOCKET SOUNDING/PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FORM/ ORDER- PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM

08/05/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY DOCKET SOUNDING/PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FORM/ ORDER- PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

07/22/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

MANATEE COUNTY DOCKET SOUNDING/PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/25/2020 AT 1:30PM

07/21/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY DOCKET SOUNDING/PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/25/2020 AT 1:30PM

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

04/24/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

04/24/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

04/01/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/31/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

03/30/2020 - ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY JOSEPH CAMPOLI, ESQUIRE

03/30/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY JOSEPH CAMPOLI, ESQUIRE

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

03/24/2020 - PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

03/17/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/07/2020 AT 01:30 PM; PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

03/16/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/07/2020 AT 01:30 PM; PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

INFORMATION

02/25/2020 - INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

02/18/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

NOTICE TO APPEAR

02/13/2020 - NOTICE TO APPEAR

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • Hearing10/20/2020 at 01:25PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Hearing08/25/2020 at 01:25PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY DOCKET SOUNDING/PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FORM/ ORDER- PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Hearing07/28/2020 at 01:25PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY DOCKET SOUNDING/PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/25/2020 AT 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Hearing05/05/2020 at 01:25PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/07/2020 AT 01:30 PM; PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present without Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 893.147.1; Description: POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less