This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/13/2020 at 08:40:01 (UTC).

KRISTIAN RAY HARRELL

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KRISTIAN RAY HARRELL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK P MERCURIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICK P MERCURIO

 

Party Details

Defendant

KRISTIAN RAY HARRELL

Bradenton, FL 34208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TRACI RENEE DISHMAN

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/07/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

ORDER STRIKING PRO SE MOTIONS FOR REDUCTION OF BOND

02/26/2020 - ORDER STRIKING PRO SE MOTIONS FOR REDUCTION OF BOND

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

02/05/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

ARREST WARRANT - SERVED

02/05/2020 - ARREST WARRANT - SERVED

COMPLAINT FILED

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT FILED

E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

01/22/2020 - E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

02/06/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BOND (PRO SE)

02/20/2020 - MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BOND (PRO SE)

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

02/12/2020 - AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

BOND REDUCTION AND/OR SUPERVISED RELEASE ORDER

03/10/2020 - BOND REDUCTION AND/OR SUPERVISED RELEASE ORDER

MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BOND (PRO SE)

02/24/2020 - MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BOND (PRO SE)

PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

02/05/2020 - PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/06/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

02/28/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • Hearing03/10/2020 at 09:00AM - JACS-BOND HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND REDUCTION AND/OR SUPERVISED RELEASE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMOTION HEARING: REPRESENTED BY TRACI RENEE DISHMAN, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER STATE REPRESENTED BY MICHELLE GRANTHAM HEARING ON MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION- GRANTED ORDER FILED IN OPEN COURT JUDGE FREDERICK MERCURIO ENTERED VIA ICPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present with Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION/SET VOP BOND, 03/10/2020 AT 9:00 AM, SEE CASE 2016-CF-1050 FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Hearing02/28/2020 at 09:00AM - ARRAIGNMENT (NOT FILED ON); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STRIKING PRO SE MOTIONS FOR REDUCTION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BOND (PRO SE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BOND (PRO SE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.12c5; Description: GRAND THEFT (FIREARM); Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less