This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 20:18:19 (UTC).

KRISTI JEAN HOSSAIN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KRISTI JEAN HOSSAIN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK P MERCURIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********13AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICK P MERCURIO

 

Party Details

Defendant

KRISTI JEAN HOSSAIN

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

MARIA T CHUQUIZUTA CLARKE

Other Attorneys

KRISTEN COLELLI

 

Court Documents

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

07/09/2020 - STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 09/14/2020 AT 09:00 AM

06/24/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 09/14/2020 AT 09:00 AM

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRIAL - DOCKET SOUNDING 09/02/2020 AT 9:00 AM AND TRIAL WEEKS 09/14/2020 AND 09/21/2020

06/24/2020 - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRIAL - DOCKET SOUNDING 09/02/2020 AT 9:00 AM AND TRIAL WEEKS 09/14/2020 AND 09/21/2020

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

06/09/2020 - STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

05/27/2020 - STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

04/02/2020 - SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

04/02/2020 - SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/26/2020 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/09/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

STIPULATION / ORDER FOR TRIAL; DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 06/22/2020 AT 9:00AM AND TRIAL SET FOR 07/06/2020 AT 9:00

03/05/2020 - STIPULATION / ORDER FOR TRIAL; DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 06/22/2020 AT 9:00AM AND TRIAL SET FOR 07/06/2020 AT 9:00

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

03/04/2020 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

02/19/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/18/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/5/2020 AT 8:30AM

02/14/2020 - ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/5/2020 AT 8:30AM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

01/31/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

INFORMATION FILED

01/29/2020 - INFORMATION FILED

AUTOMATIC BAIL BONDS - UFCIC - $1500

01/22/2020 - AUTOMATIC BAIL BONDS - UFCIC - $1500

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • Hearing09/14/2020 at 09:00AM - JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Hearing09/02/2020 at 09:00AM - DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Hearing07/06/2020 at 09:00AM - JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Hearing06/24/2020 at 09:00AM - DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 09/14/2020 AT 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRIAL - DOCKET SOUNDING 09/02/2020 AT 9:00 AM AND TRIAL WEEKS 09/14/2020 AND 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/5/2020 AT 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCOURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTOMATIC BAIL BONDS - UFCIC - $1500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 893.13.6a; Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE (METHAMPHETAMINE); Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less