This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 14:01:37 (UTC).

KOURTNEY VONTEVICA MATTHEWS

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KOURTNEY VONTEVICA MATTHEWS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK P MERCURIO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********11AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICK P MERCURIO

 

Party Details

Defendant

KOURTNEY VONTEVICA MATTHEWS

Palmetto, FL 34221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ALLANAH LOUISE MCCLINTOCK

Other Attorneys

MICHELLE GRANTHAM

 

Court Documents

AMENDED-COST WORKSHEET - REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY

07/30/2020 - AMENDED-COST WORKSHEET - REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY

COST WORKSHEET - REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY

07/30/2020 - COST WORKSHEET - REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

07/30/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODE SCORESHEET

07/30/2020 - CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODE SCORESHEET

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

07/22/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - CASE MANAGEMENT ON 07/30/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8-A

06/04/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - CASE MANAGEMENT ON 07/30/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8-A

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

04/24/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

04/22/2020 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

04/07/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APRIL 23, 2020 @ 8:30AM COURTROOM 8-A

04/03/2020 - ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APRIL 23, 2020 @ 8:30AM COURTROOM 8-A

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/23/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

INFORMATION FILED

03/19/2020 - INFORMATION FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

02/21/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

ORDER EXTENDING PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

02/14/2020 - ORDER EXTENDING PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

I BOND U OUT BAIL BONDS; PSC; $1500.00 / 7500.00

02/10/2020 - I BOND U OUT BAIL BONDS; PSC; $1500.00 / 7500.00

SARASOTA COUNTY SHERIFF ARREST CARD - WORKING COPY

02/07/2020 - SARASOTA COUNTY SHERIFF ARREST CARD - WORKING COPY

(2) ARREST WARRANT RETURNED (HOLD/BOND SARASOTA COUNTY)

01/27/2020 - (2) ARREST WARRANT RETURNED (HOLD/BOND SARASOTA COUNTY)

ARREST WARRANT ISSUED (2 COUNTS)

01/22/2020 - ARREST WARRANT ISSUED (2 COUNTS)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR RESTITUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Hearing07/30/2020 at 08:30AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED-COST WORKSHEET - REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET - REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODE SCORESHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketREPRESENTED BY ALLANAH MCCLINTOCK, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER VIA ZOOM STATE REPRESENTED BY MICHELLE GRANTHAM VIA ZOOM AS TO COUNTS I AND II PLED GUILTY, ADJUDICATION WITHHELD PLACED ON 24 MONTHS DRUG OFFENDER PROBATION CONCURRENT EACH COUNT CURFEW FROM 10 PM TILL 6 AM CAN BE MODIFIED FOR WORK AND TREATMENT PURPOSES WITHIN 30 DAYS RECEIVE DRUG EVALUATION AND ENTER IN AND SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETE TREATMENT AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE ON FIRST ATTEMPT RANDOM URINALYSIS MAKE BEST EFFORTS TO HAVE FORMER EMPLOYER PROVIDE INSURANCE INFORMATION TO VICTIM 250 HOURS PUBLIC SERVICE WORK HOURS TO PERFORM MINIMUM OF 15 PER MONTH TO COMMENCE AUGUST 2020 SUBMIT BIOLOGICAL SPECIMEN FOR FDLE - DNA DATABANK PURSUANT TO F.S. 943.325 SEE COST SHEET FOR MONETARY OBLIGATIONS THIRTY DAYS TO FILE AN APPEAL JUDGE FREDERICK MERCURIO ENTERED VIA ICPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S MOTION TO EXTEND PAWN SHOP HOLDING PERIOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketI BOND U OUT BAIL BONDS; PSC; $1500.00 / 7500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSARASOTA COUNTY SHERIFF ARREST CARD - WORKING COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(2) ARREST WARRANT RETURNED (HOLD/BOND SARASOTA COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED (2 COUNTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED (2 COUNTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 539.001.8b8a; Description: OBTAINING MONEY FROM PAWN BROKER BY FRAUD (LESS THAN $300); Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 812.019.1; Description: DEALING IN STOLEN PROPERTY (SECOND DEGREE); Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less