This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 04:32:38 (UTC).

KEVIN A GERRY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KEVIN A GERRY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********66AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Defendant

KEVIN A GERRY

Bradenton, FL 34209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LINDSAY MICHELLE MEYER

ANGELA MARIE GREENWALT

 

Court Documents

ADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL

05/20/2020 - ADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL

DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT

02/18/2020 - DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT

WAIVER OF COUNSEL/WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

02/18/2020 - WAIVER OF COUNSEL/WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

INFORMATION

02/13/2020 - INFORMATION

NOTICE TO APPEAR

01/22/2020 - NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF LETTER RE DEFENDANT SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION OF PRETRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$265.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 811578; Tender Amount: $265.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Hearing02/19/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF COUNSEL/WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.13a; Description: PETIT THEFT (LESS THAN $100); Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less