This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/19/2020 at 12:55:09 (UTC).

KELLY L GRADY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KELLY L GRADY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILBERT A SMITH JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********99AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILBERT A SMITH JR

 

Party Details

Defendant

KELLY L GRADY

Bradenton, FL 34208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HANNAH RAISSA IBANEZ

MARK R ADAMS

DAPHNEY ELAINE BRANHAM

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

04/09/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): AGGRAVATED ASSAULT; CRIMINAL MISCHIEF ($1000 OR MORE); DECLINE THE CHARGES IN CIRCUIT COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

04/08/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): AGGRAVATED ASSAULT; CRIMINAL MISCHIEF ($1000 OR MORE); DECLINE THE CHARGES IN CIRCUIT COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS- FILED BY DAPHNEY BRANHAM, OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT & CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

03/19/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS- FILED BY DAPHNEY BRANHAM, OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT & CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

03/18/2020 - ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

03/17/2020 - PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

02/14/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/07/2020 - AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SMITTY'S BAIL BOND; ACC; $1500.00 / 1500.00

01/24/2020 - SMITTY'S BAIL BOND; ACC; $1500.00 / 1500.00

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/24/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

01/23/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/23/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/23/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/24/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ARREST WARRANT RETURNED SERVED (COUNT 2)

01/23/2020 - ARREST WARRANT RETURNED SERVED (COUNT 2)

ARREST WARRANT RETURNED SERVED (COUNT 1)

01/23/2020 - ARREST WARRANT RETURNED SERVED (COUNT 1)

COMPLAINT FOR ARREST WARRANT FILED (2)

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR ARREST WARRANT FILED (2)

E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED (2)

01/22/2020 - E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED (2)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): AGGRAVATED ASSAULT; CRIMINAL MISCHIEF ($1000 OR MORE); DECLINE THE CHARGES IN CIRCUIT COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS- FILED BY DAPHNEY BRANHAM, OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT & CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Hearing02/14/2020 at 09:00AM - ARRAIGNMENT (NOT FILED ON); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMITTY'S BAIL BOND; ACC; $1500.00 / 1500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT RETURNED SERVED (COUNT 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT RETURNED SERVED (COUNT 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR ARREST WARRANT FILED (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 806.13.1a1b; Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF LESS THAN $1,000; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.021.1a; Description: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT; Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less