This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/14/2020 at 09:04:24 (UTC).

KATHY JO HAYDU-TINYES

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KATHY JO HAYDU-TINYES was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Defendant

KATHY JO HAYDU-TINYES

Parrish, FL 34219

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

02/12/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/23/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE COURT DATE NOTIFICATION

01/23/2020 - RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE COURT DATE NOTIFICATION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/22/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER - ROR ( REPRESENTED AT FIRST APPEARANCE BY STEVE LAVELY)

01/22/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER - ROR ( REPRESENTED AT FIRST APPEARANCE BY STEVE LAVELY)

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/22/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing02/24/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE COURT DATE NOTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE-SIMPLE (DOMESTIC); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER - ROR ( REPRESENTED AT FIRST APPEARANCE BY STEVE LAVELY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less