This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/18/2020 at 06:22:50 (UTC).

JULIO C ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 JULIO C ORTIZ was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********01AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Defendant

JULIO C ORTIZ

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOS NICHOLOUDIS

Other Attorneys

LINDSAY MICHELLE MEYER

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING SENTENCE

03/27/2020 - STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING SENTENCE

COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

03/02/2020 - COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

03/02/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

INFORMATION

02/19/2020 - INFORMATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/04/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

02/03/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/31/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

01/31/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/31/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/31/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT CERTIFIED COPY RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENTS DOCKET MODULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketREPRESENTED BY DAMIEN BYTHROW, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER STATE REPRESENTED BY GREGORY HREBINKO PLED NOLO CONTENDERE; ADJUDGED GUILTY SENTENCED TO 60 DAYS COUNTY JAIL WITH CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED IN THE COUNTY JAIL MONETARY OBLIGATIONS ORDERED JUDGE HEATHER DOYLE ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.13b; Description: PETIT THEFT AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less