Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/01/2021 at 18:31:56 (UTC).

JUAN CARLOS RIVERAROSARIO

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 JUAN CARLOS RIVERAROSARIO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LON S AREND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********29AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LON S AREND

 

Party Details

Defendant

JUAN CARLOS RIVERAROSARIO

Bradenton, FL 34207

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): FELONY BATTERY AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN CIRCUIT COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

03/23/2021 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): FELONY BATTERY AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN CIRCUIT COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

03/02/2021 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

03/01/2021 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

03/01/2021 - PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

03/01/2021 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

03/01/2021 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - DID NOT PROCESS - CHARGES DROPPED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Hearing03/26/2021 at 09:00AM - ARRAIGNMENT (NOT FILED ON); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): FELONY BATTERY AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION. DECLINE THE CHARGES IN CIRCUIT COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.2; Description: FELONY BATTERY AFTER PRIOR CONVICITON-BATTERY; Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less