This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 12:51:01 (UTC).

JOSIAS SEN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 JOSIAS SEN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********55AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Defendant

JOSIAS SEN

Sarasota, FL 34235

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CURTIS A GRIFFIN

 

Court Documents

COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

02/24/2020 - COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS, WAIVER OF ATTORNEY, WAIVER OF RIGHTS FILED IN OPEN COURT

02/24/2020 - ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS, WAIVER OF ATTORNEY, WAIVER OF RIGHTS FILED IN OPEN COURT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

02/24/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

CRIMINAL SUMMONS FILED SERVED

02/03/2020 - CRIMINAL SUMMONS FILED SERVED

INFORMATION FILED

01/22/2020 - INFORMATION FILED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$294.25; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 823495; Tender Amount: $294.25;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing02/24/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing02/24/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS, WAIVER OF ATTORNEY, WAIVER OF RIGHTS FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAIVES COUNSEL STATE REPRESENTED BY LIMEECHA DUNBAR PLED NOLO CONTENDERE; ADJUDICATION WITHHELD MONETARY OBLIGATIONS ORDERED JUDGE MARK D. SINGER ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present without Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL SUMMONS FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (MAILED 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 893.13.6b; Description: POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA (NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less