This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 13:49:57 (UTC).

JOSEPH ANTHONY HOLDA

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 JOSEPH ANTHONY HOLDA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT A FARRANCE and JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********70AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT A FARRANCE

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Defendants

JOSEPH ANTHONY HOLDA

Bradenton, FL 34209

JOSEPH A HOLDA

Bradenton, FL 34209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOS NICHOLOUDIS

Other Attorneys

LINDSAY MICHELLE MEYER

ASHLEY BROOKE CALL

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 09/29/2020 AT 1:30 PM

07/07/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 09/29/2020 AT 1:30 PM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

05/01/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

04/06/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/19/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/14/2020 AT 1:30 PM

03/09/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/14/2020 AT 1:30 PM

E-ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND ORDER OF ARREST AND COMMITMENT WARRANT ISSUED (2 COUNTS)

02/27/2020 - E-ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND ORDER OF ARREST AND COMMITMENT WARRANT ISSUED (2 COUNTS)

INFORMATION

02/13/2020 - INFORMATION

INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

02/12/2020 - INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/11/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

02/07/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/06/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

02/06/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

02/06/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

02/06/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • Hearing09/29/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: STEELE, JACQUELINE BLANTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Hearing09/29/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Hearing07/07/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 09/29/2020 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Hearing05/12/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Hearing04/14/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 810.09.1a2; Description: TRESPASS AFTER NOTICE ON PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 843.02.; Description: RESISTING, OBSTRUCTING OR OPPOSING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less