This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 01:09:46 (UTC).

JOSEPH A HOLDA

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 JOSEPH A HOLDA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Defendant

JOSEPH A HOLDA

Bradenton, FL 34029

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LINDSAY MICHELLE MEYER

 

Court Documents

NOLLE PROSEQUI

03/09/2020 - NOLLE PROSEQUI

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

03/09/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/09/2020 AT 08:25 AM

03/02/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/09/2020 AT 08:25 AM

INFORMATION

02/18/2020 - INFORMATION

CASH BOND FILED

01/30/2020 - CASH BOND FILED

HOLMES BEACH POLICE DEPARTMENT - WITNESS / VICTIM STATEMENT

01/30/2020 - HOLMES BEACH POLICE DEPARTMENT - WITNESS / VICTIM STATEMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/30/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCASH BOND REFUND CHK # 00334406, DATED 03/23/2020 REMITTED TO DEPOSITOR IN THE AMOUNT OF $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$240.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 815934; Tender Amount: $120.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: DISMISSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT NOT PRESENT STATE REPRESENTED BY LINDSEY MEYER NOLLE PROSEQUI FILED IN OPEN COURT JUDGE ROBERT A. FARRANCE ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFENDANT ASKING FOR ANOTHER COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/09/2020 AT 08:25 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$240.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 800080; Tender Amount: $120.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH BOND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHOLMES BEACH POLICE DEPARTMENT - WITNESS / VICTIM STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 999.9999.9999; Description: CAMPING; Degree: N/A;

    Read MoreRead Less