This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 05:09:53 (UTC).

JONATHAN FRANKLIN HUNTER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 JONATHAN FRANKLIN HUNTER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICK P MERCURIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********14AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICK P MERCURIO

 

Party Details

Defendant

JONATHAN FRANKLIN HUNTER

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MARIA T CHUQUIZUTA CLARKE

Other Attorneys

KRISTEN COLELLI

 

Court Documents

SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION

06/29/2020 - SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 09/14/2020 AT 09:00 AM

06/22/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 09/14/2020 AT 09:00 AM

2ND SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION (PAGE 3 BLANK)

06/19/2020 - 2ND SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION (PAGE 3 BLANK)

NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION

06/11/2020 - NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

06/11/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION (PAGE 3 BLANK)

06/10/2020 - SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION (PAGE 3 BLANK)

SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

06/01/2020 - SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

04/14/2020 - MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

AUTOAMATIC BAIL BONDS, UFCIC, $20000

04/13/2020 - AUTOAMATIC BAIL BONDS, UFCIC, $20000

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- JAIL DEFENDANTS DOCKET SOUNDING ON 06/22/2020 AT 09:00 AM, JURY TRIAL ON 07/06/2020 AT 09:00 AM

04/09/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- JAIL DEFENDANTS DOCKET SOUNDING ON 06/22/2020 AT 09:00 AM, JURY TRIAL ON 07/06/2020 AT 09:00 AM

INFORMATION

02/24/2020 - INFORMATION

ORDER ON MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

02/11/2020 - ORDER ON MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING: 2/11/2020 AT 8:30AM (MOTION TO REDUCE BOND/SROR)

02/05/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING: 2/11/2020 AT 8:30AM (MOTION TO REDUCE BOND/SROR)

MOTION TO REDUCE BAIL AND PERMIT THE RELEASE OF THE DEFENDANT ON REDUCED BOND AND/OR OTHER CONDITIONS

02/05/2020 - MOTION TO REDUCE BAIL AND PERMIT THE RELEASE OF THE DEFENDANT ON REDUCED BOND AND/OR OTHER CONDITIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, AND NOT GUILTY PLEA FILED BY LELAND TAYLOR, ESQUIRE

02/05/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, AND NOT GUILTY PLEA FILED BY LELAND TAYLOR, ESQUIRE

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/23/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

01/22/2020 - PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • Hearing09/14/2020 at 09:00AM - JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Hearing09/02/2020 at 09:00AM - DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Hearing07/06/2020 at 09:00AM - JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Hearing06/24/2020 at 09:00AM - DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Hearing06/22/2020 at 09:00AM - JAIL DEFENDANTS DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Hearing06/22/2020 at 09:00AM - JAIL DEFENDANTS DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 8-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 09/14/2020 AT 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION / ORDER FOR TRIAL: DOCKEET SOUNDING SET FOR 09/02/2020 AT 9:00AM AND TRIAL ON 09/14/2020 AT 9:00AM - SEE 2020CF176AX FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket2ND SUBPOENA FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION (PAGE 3 BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO REDUCE BAIL AND PERMIT THE RELEASE OF THE DEFENDANT ON REDUCED BOND AND/OR OTHER CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, AND NOT GUILTY PLEA FILED BY LELAND TAYLOR, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS~INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED-SEE CASE # 2020CF176 FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 810.02.13C; Description: BURGLARY OF AN OCCUPIED DWELLING; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less