This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/22/2020 at 07:52:54 (UTC).

JERRY L GIESKE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 JERRY L GIESKE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********63AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Defendant

JERRY L GIESKE

Bradenton, FL 34210

 

Court Documents

COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

01/22/2020 - COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/23/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/22/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER - DEFENDANT PLED

01/22/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER - DEFENDANT PLED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

01/22/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/22/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT CERTIFIED COPY RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENTS DOCKET MODULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER - DEFENDANT PLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE / DEFENDANT PRESENT - WAIVES COUNSEL & FORMAL FILING OF THE INFORMATION STATE REPRESENTED BY ROBERT ELLIS GAIL PLED NOLO CONTENDERE; ADJUDGED GUILTY SENTENCED TO COUNTY JAIL WITH CREDIT TIME SERVED MONETARY OBLIGATIONS ORDERED JUDGE DENO G ECONOMOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 810.09.2b; Description: FAIL LEAVE PROPERTY UPON ORDER BY OWNER; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less