This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 11:00:29 (UTC).

JASON ROBBIN SYREK

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 JASON ROBBIN SYREK was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********31AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Defendant

JASON ROBBIN SYREK

Riverview, FL 33579

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DONALD CARL ANDERSON III

Other Attorneys

TYLER MARCELLAS EGBERT

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION

02/09/2022 - INFORMATION

ERIC ESTES BAIL BONDS, OSII, $20,000.00

02/25/2022 - ERIC ESTES BAIL BONDS, OSII, $20,000.00

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY/ WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, REQUEST FOR DISPOSITIONAL OFFER FROM THIS HONORABLE COURT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY- FILED BY DONALD ANDERSON, ESQUIRE

02/26/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY/ WAIVER OF APPEARANCE, REQUEST FOR DISPOSITIONAL OFFER FROM THIS HONORABLE COURT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY- FILED BY DONALD ANDERSON, ESQUIRE

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/25/2022 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/09/2022 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

E-CAPIAS ISSUED

02/09/2022 - E-CAPIAS ISSUED

ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS

02/09/2022 - ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS

CAPIAS FILED - SERVED

02/25/2022 - CAPIAS FILED - SERVED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 04/26/2023 AT 09:00 AM

02/22/2023 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 04/26/2023 AT 09:00 AM

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 02/22/2023 AT 09:00 AM

12/21/2022 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 02/22/2023 AT 09:00 AM

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - CASE MANAGEMENT ON 12/21/2022 AT 09:00 AM

10/19/2022 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - CASE MANAGEMENT ON 12/21/2022 AT 09:00 AM

MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL

10/19/2022 - MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 10/19/2022 AT 09:00 AM

08/17/2022 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 10/19/2022 AT 09:00 AM

STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 10/19/2022

08/17/2022 - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 10/19/2022

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- CASE MANAGEMENT ON 08/17/2022 AT 09:30 AM

06/01/2022 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- CASE MANAGEMENT ON 08/17/2022 AT 09:30 AM

STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 08/17/2022 AT 09:30 AM

06/01/2022 - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 08/17/2022 AT 09:30 AM

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

04/25/2022 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

MOTION TO TAKE COMPULSORY NOTICE

04/21/2022 - MOTION TO TAKE COMPULSORY NOTICE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: WHYTE, STEPHEN MATHEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Hearing02/22/2023 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: WHYTE, STEPHEN MATHEW; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 04/26/2023 AT 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketEvent CRCM scheduled on 4/26/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge STEPHEN WHYTE presiding. EventID 1511368

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event CRCM on 2/22/2023 0900 AM Judge STEPHEN WHYTE results CONTINUED on 2/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDefendant Present by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: WHYTE, STEPHEN MATHEW; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 02/22/2023 AT 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEvent CRCM scheduled on 2/22/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge STEPHEN WHYTE presiding. EventID 1493783

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event CRCM on 12/21/2022 0900 AM Judge STEPHEN WHYTE results CONTINUED on 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent CRARRCHG scheduled on 3/18/2022 at 0855 AM, JC - Judge STEPHEN WHYTE presiding. EventID 1406642

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM- ATTACHED IS THE INFOMATION FOR THE ABOVE-REFERENCED CASE WHICH IS A SPECIALTY DIVISION CASE AND SHOULD BE ASSIGNED TO FELONY DIVISON 1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-CAPIAS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CF000331CFAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketJudge: WHYTE , STEPHEN MATHEW assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.12a; Description: GRAND THEFT FIRST DEGREE ($100,000 OR MORE); Degree: First Degree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less