This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 14:33:01 (UTC).

JAIME ALCANTAR

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 JAIME ALCANTAR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********49AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

JAIME ALCANTAR

Port, FL 34288

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN J LAIL

Other Attorneys

DEANNA MAY CIPRIANO

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 08/11/2020 AT 01:25 PM

07/14/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 08/11/2020 AT 01:25 PM

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 07/14/2020 AT 01:25 PM

06/16/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 07/14/2020 AT 01:25 PM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

04/16/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/19/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE -PRINTED

03/19/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE -PRINTED

INFORMATION

03/19/2020 - INFORMATION

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/23/2020 AT 08:30 AM

03/09/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/23/2020 AT 08:30 AM

DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

03/02/2020 - DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, REQUEST FOR INFORMATION, CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT, DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, REQUEST TO INSPECT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, WITNESS LIST, DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DISCLOSURE TO PROSECUTION FILED BY BRIAN J. LAIL, ESQUIRE

03/02/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, REQUEST FOR INFORMATION, CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT, DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, REQUEST TO INSPECT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, WITNESS LIST, DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DISCLOSURE TO PROSECUTION FILED BY BRIAN J. LAIL, ESQUIRE

CASH BOND FILED

02/05/2020 - CASH BOND FILED

BRADENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT MANATEE COUNTY VICTIM NOTIFICATION INFORMATION

02/05/2020 - BRADENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT MANATEE COUNTY VICTIM NOTIFICATION INFORMATION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/05/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • Hearing08/11/2020 at 01:25PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 01:25PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 08/11/2020 AT 01:25 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Hearing06/16/2020 at 01:25PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 07/14/2020 AT 01:25 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Hearing04/27/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Hearing04/27/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD: ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/23/2020 AT 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, REQUEST FOR INFORMATION, CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT, DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, REQUEST TO INSPECT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, WITNESS LIST, DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DISCLOSURE TO PROSECUTION FILED BY BRIAN J. LAIL, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$500.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 802897; Tender Amount: $500.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH BOND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRADENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT MANATEE COUNTY VICTIM NOTIFICATION INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less