This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/29/2020 at 14:22:42 (UTC).

ISRAEL MENA

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ISRAEL MENA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Defendant

ISRAEL MENA

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAMIEN JOSEPH BYTHROW

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

02/25/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 02/26/2020 AT 08:20 AM

02/24/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 02/26/2020 AT 08:20 AM

NOTICE OF HEARING ( MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT HEARING 02/26/2020 8:30 AM)

02/24/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING ( MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT HEARING 02/26/2020 8:30 AM)

MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

02/24/2020 - MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

02/07/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING ( BOND HEARING 02/07/2020 8:30 AM)

02/05/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING ( BOND HEARING 02/07/2020 8:30 AM)

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

01/27/2020 - MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/23/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/24/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

01/22/2020 - PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

01/22/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/22/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • Hearing02/26/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): BATTERY; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing02/24/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 02/26/2020 AT 08:20 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT HEARING 02/26/2020 8:30 AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present with Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Hearing02/07/2020 at 08:30AM - MOTION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMOTION HEARING: REPRESENTED BY DAMIEN BYTHROW, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER STATE REPRESENTED BY ROBERT GAIL HEARING ON MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION-DENIED JUDGE HEATHER DOYLE ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( BOND HEARING 02/07/2020 8:30 AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE-SIMPLE (DOMESTIC); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less