This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/28/2020 at 17:31:35 (UTC).

IDALIZ SHEA RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 IDALIZ SHEA RODRIGUEZ was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LON S AREND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********17AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LON S AREND

 

Party Details

Defendant

IDALIZ SHEA RODRIGUEZ

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PETER JAMES LOMBARDO

Other Attorneys

JAMES CHARLES SIEGFREID

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- SET FOR DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/22/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 10/05/2020 AT 09:00 AM

07/14/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- SET FOR DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/22/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 10/05/2020 AT 09:00 AM

ORDER SETTING HEARING/CONTINUANCE- SET FOR DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/22/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 10/05/2020 AT 09:00 AM

07/14/2020 - ORDER SETTING HEARING/CONTINUANCE- SET FOR DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/22/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 10/05/2020 AT 09:00 AM

STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

06/23/2020 - STATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

04/06/2020 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

03/17/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

STIPULATION/ORDER FOR TRIAL- DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 7/14/2020 AT 9:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL 7/27/2020

03/16/2020 - STIPULATION/ORDER FOR TRIAL- DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 7/14/2020 AT 9:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL 7/27/2020

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/10/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED-FOR COST

02/27/2020 - AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED-FOR COST

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

02/18/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

MOTION TO OBTAIN, DISCLOSE AND PRODUCE BRADY INFORMATION

02/18/2020 - MOTION TO OBTAIN, DISCLOSE AND PRODUCE BRADY INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED BY PETER LOMBARDO, ESQUIRE

02/18/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED BY PETER LOMBARDO, ESQUIRE

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/07/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

CAPIAS - SERVED

02/07/2020 - CAPIAS - SERVED

E-CAPIAS ISSUED

01/31/2020 - E-CAPIAS ISSUED

FHP INCIDENT REPORT

01/29/2020 - FHP INCIDENT REPORT

VICTIM NOTIFICATION INFORMATION

01/29/2020 - VICTIM NOTIFICATION INFORMATION

INFORMATION FILED

01/29/2020 - INFORMATION FILED

ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS

01/29/2020 - ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • Hearing10/05/2020 at 09:00AM - JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: AREND, LON S;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Hearing09/22/2020 at 09:00AM - DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: AREND, LON S;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Hearing07/27/2020 at 09:00AM - JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 09:00AM - DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD- SET FOR DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/22/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 10/05/2020 AT 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING/CONTINUANCE- SET FOR DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/22/2020 AT 09:00 AM AND JURY TRIAL ON 10/05/2020 AT 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S SUPPLEMENTAL/AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Hearing03/31/2020 at 08:30AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-A; Judge: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-CAPIAS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFHP INCIDENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVICTIM NOTIFICATION INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 316.193.3c2; Description: DRIVING UNDER THE INFLUENCE WITH SERIOUS BODILY INJURY; Degree: Third Degree; Citation: A76PCNE;

    Read MoreRead Less