This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/29/2020 at 12:48:15 (UTC).

HINTON DWAYNE FOLDS

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 HINTON DWAYNE FOLDS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILBERT A SMITH JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILBERT A SMITH JR

 

Party Details

Defendant

HINTON DWAYNE FOLDS

Bradenton, FL 34208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ALISON COSSETTI CLOUGH

Other Attorneys

DANIEL LEY

LINDSEY NICOLE BRIGHAM

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

07/01/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

05/18/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/06/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

03/03/2020 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/4/2020 AT 9:00AM

02/21/2020 - ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/4/2020 AT 9:00AM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

02/24/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

AUTOMATIC BAIL BONDS; FCSI; $20,000.00

01/27/2020 - AUTOMATIC BAIL BONDS; FCSI; $20,000.00

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/27/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/28/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

01/27/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/27/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED

01/27/2020 - CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

INFORMATION

01/22/2020 - INFORMATION

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION, & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

01/22/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION, & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS

01/22/2020 - ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS

E-CAPIAS ISSUED

01/22/2020 - E-CAPIAS ISSUED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • Hearing08/19/2020 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Hearing06/24/2020 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Hearing05/11/2020 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Hearing03/04/2020 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION, & DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-CAPIAS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 784.041.1; Description: FELONY BATTERY; Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less