This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/28/2020 at 07:18:38 (UTC).

HERBERT M SPARKMAN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 HERBERT M SPARKMAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********69AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Defendant

HERBERT M SPARKMAN

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL JOSEPH DAVIDS

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 10/13/2020 AT 01:25 PM IN COURTROOM 6-C

08/18/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 10/13/2020 AT 01:25 PM IN COURTROOM 6-C

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY SCOTT E. RUDACILLE, ESQUIRE

04/29/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY SCOTT E. RUDACILLE, ESQUIRE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

04/16/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FILED

03/11/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FILED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4-28-2020 AT 1:30 PM

03/06/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4-28-2020 AT 1:30 PM

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/05/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/11/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD-NON JURY TRIAL SET FOR 3-6-2020 AT 10:00 AM

02/07/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD-NON JURY TRIAL SET FOR 3-6-2020 AT 10:00 AM

NOTICE TO APPEAR

01/22/2020 - NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • Hearing10/13/2020 at 01:25PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Hearing08/18/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 10/13/2020 AT 01:25 PM IN COURTROOM 6-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Hearing07/21/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY DOCKET SOUNDING/PRE TRIAL CONFERENE FORM- CASE IS RESET FOR PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 8-18-2020 AT 1:30 PM...SEE CASE 2020MO101AX FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY SCOTT E. RUDACILLE, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Hearing04/28/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (SEE 2019 MO 004865 AX FOR IMAGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Hearing02/19/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Hearing02/07/2020 at 01:30PM - NON JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD-NON JURY TRIAL SET FOR 3-6-2020 AT 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCOURT APPOINTS PUBLIC DEFENDER BASED ON APPOINTMENT IN CASE 2020MM101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 999.9999.9999; Description: UNLAWFUL ACTIVITY W/IN PUBLIC ROAD; Degree: N/A;

    Read MoreRead Less