This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/16/2020 at 01:01:21 (UTC).

FRANK JOSEPH SIRIGNANO

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 FRANK JOSEPH SIRIGNANO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********57AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Defendant

FRANK JOSEPH SIRIGNANO

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL JOSEPH DAVIDS

Other Attorneys

CURTIS A GRIFFIN

 

Court Documents

COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

01/31/2020 - COST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

01/31/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

INFORMATION

01/24/2020 - INFORMATION

NOTICE OF HEARING; BOND HEARING; 01/31/2020 8:30 AM

01/23/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING; BOND HEARING; 01/31/2020 8:30 AM

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

01/23/2020 - MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/22/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/21/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

01/17/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/16/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/15/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER - DEFERS FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOR 48 HOURS

01/15/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER - DEFERS FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOR 48 HOURS

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/15/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/15/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • Hearing02/19/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Hearing02/19/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT CERTIFIED COPY RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMONETARY FINAL JUDGMENTS DOCKET MODULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Hearing01/31/2020 at 08:30AM - MOTION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER - DEFERS FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE FOR 48 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 810.09.1a2a; Description: TRESPASS AFTER NOTICE ON PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 843.02.; Description: RESISTING, OBSTRUCTING OR OPPOSING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less