This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/29/2020 at 12:56:34 (UTC).

EARL A CHATMAN

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 EARL A CHATMAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********41AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendants

EARL A CHATMAN

Bradenton, FL 34208

EARL ALVIN CHATMAN JR

Bradenton, FL 34208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JENNIFER D JOYNT-SANCHEZ

CARLY J ROBBINS-GILBERT

Other Attorneys

DEANNA MAY CIPRIANO

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/10/2020 AT 01:30 PM; JURY TRIAL ON 09/21/2020 AT 08:30 AM

07/14/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/10/2020 AT 01:30 PM; JURY TRIAL ON 09/21/2020 AT 08:30 AM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

07/09/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/17/2020 - AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/16/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

03/13/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/21/2020 AT 01:30 PM

03/11/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 04/21/2020 AT 01:30 PM

INFORMATION

03/10/2020 - INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

02/19/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE-PRINTED

PRE-TRIAL SERVICES REJECTION FORM

02/13/2020 - PRE-TRIAL SERVICES REJECTION FORM

BAD BOY BAIL BONDS, RSCCI, $1500

02/12/2020 - BAD BOY BAIL BONDS, RSCCI, $1500

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

02/11/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

02/10/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

02/10/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/10/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

ARREST WARRANT FILED SERVED

02/10/2020 - ARREST WARRANT FILED SERVED

E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

01/30/2020 - E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR ARREST WARRANT FILED

01/30/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR ARREST WARRANT FILED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • Hearing09/21/2020 at 08:30AM - JURY TRIAL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-B; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Hearing09/10/2020 at 01:30PM - DOCKET SOUNDING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET DOCKET SOUNDING ON 09/10/2020 AT 01:30 PM; JURY TRIAL ON 09/21/2020 AT 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Hearing04/21/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL SERVICES REJECTION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAD BOY BAIL BONDS, RSCCI, $1500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR ARREST WARRANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less