This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/22/2020 at 07:52:41 (UTC).

DYLAN JOHN FOXWORTHY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 DYLAN JOHN FOXWORTHY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********43AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Defendant

DYLAN JOHN FOXWORTHY

Bradenton, FL 34207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOS NICHOLOUDIS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): CRIMINAL MISCHIEF ($200 OR LESS). DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

02/21/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): CRIMINAL MISCHIEF ($200 OR LESS). DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/30/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

01/29/2020 - PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER/JUDGES ORDER (COURT APPOINTS PUBLIC DEFENDER, IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

01/29/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER/JUDGES ORDER (COURT APPOINTS PUBLIC DEFENDER, IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/29/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND ORDER OF ARREST AND COMMITMENT RETURNED SERVED

01/29/2020 - ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND ORDER OF ARREST AND COMMITMENT RETURNED SERVED

ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND ORDER OF ARREST AND COMMITMENT ISSUED

01/28/2020 - ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND ORDER OF ARREST AND COMMITMENT ISSUED

INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

01/27/2020 - INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/23/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/24/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

01/22/2020 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

01/22/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/22/2020 - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/22/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing02/24/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION ( ARREST CHARGE(S): CRIMINAL MISCHIEF ($200 OR LESS). DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED ABOVE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER/JUDGES ORDER (COURT APPOINTS PUBLIC DEFENDER, IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND ORDER OF ARREST AND COMMITMENT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND ORDER OF ARREST AND COMMITMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 806.13.1a1b; Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF $200 AND UNDER; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less