This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/11/2020 at 05:14:37 (UTC).

DENNIS LEE SIMMONS

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 DENNIS LEE SIMMONS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********05AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Defendant

DENNIS LEE SIMMONS

Bradenton, FL 34203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RONALD JOSEPH FILIPKOWSKI

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

07/01/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): RESISTING, OBSTRUCTING OR OPPOSING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE; TRESPASS ON PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED

07/01/2020 - NOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): RESISTING, OBSTRUCTING OR OPPOSING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE; TRESPASS ON PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE- PRINTED

04/29/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE- PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/20/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

03/13/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/25/2020 AT 08:30 AM

03/11/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/25/2020 AT 08:30 AM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS ELECTION TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY, REQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION/PETITION OR CHARGING DOCUMENT FILED BY RONALD J. FILIPKOWSKI, ESQUIRE

03/11/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS ELECTION TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY, REQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION/PETITION OR CHARGING DOCUMENT FILED BY RONALD J. FILIPKOWSKI, ESQUIRE

SMITTY BAIL BOND; ACC; $500.00 (2)

02/10/2020 - SMITTY BAIL BOND; ACC; $500.00 (2)

PALMETTO POLICE DEPARTMENT - COST AFFIDAVIT, VICTIM NOTIFICATION, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

02/10/2020 - PALMETTO POLICE DEPARTMENT - COST AFFIDAVIT, VICTIM NOTIFICATION, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/10/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • Hearing07/06/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION; ARREST CHARGE(S): RESISTING, OBSTRUCTING OR OPPOSING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE; TRESPASS ON PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; DECLINE THE CHARGES IN COUNTY COURT, NO FURTHER ACTION WILL BE TAKEN AS TO THE CHARGES LISTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Hearing05/06/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE- PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Hearing03/25/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Hearing03/11/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT ON 03/25/2020 AT 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE/PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS ELECTION TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY, REQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION/PETITION OR CHARGING DOCUMENT FILED BY RONALD J. FILIPKOWSKI, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMITTY BAIL BOND; ACC; $500.00 (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPALMETTO POLICE DEPARTMENT - COST AFFIDAVIT, VICTIM NOTIFICATION, AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RECEIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 810.09.2b; Description: TRESPASS AFTER WARNING - PROPERTY; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 843.02.; Description: RESISTING, OBSTRUCTING, OR OPPOSING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less