This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/23/2020 at 01:05:47 (UTC).

DAVID A SPEAKMAN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 DAVID A SPEAKMAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********68AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Defendant

DAVID A SPEAKMAN

Bradenton, FL 34205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL JOSEPH DAVIDS

Other Attorneys

CURTIS A GRIFFIN

 

Court Documents

COST WORKSHEET - REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY

03/20/2020 - COST WORKSHEET - REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

03/20/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING ( BOND HEARING 03/20/2020 8:30 AM)

03/19/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING ( BOND HEARING 03/20/2020 8:30 AM)

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/17/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/25/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

COPY OF CORRECTED FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER/JUDGES ORDER (COURT APPOINTS PUBLIC DEFENDER, IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

02/21/2020 - COPY OF CORRECTED FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER/JUDGES ORDER (COURT APPOINTS PUBLIC DEFENDER, IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

02/21/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

COPY OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER/JUDGES ORDER (COURT APPOINTS PUBLIC DEFENDER, IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

02/20/2020 - COPY OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER/JUDGES ORDER (COURT APPOINTS PUBLIC DEFENDER, IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/20/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

BENCH WARRANT FILED SERVED

02/20/2020 - BENCH WARRANT FILED SERVED

INFORMATION

02/12/2020 - INFORMATION

E-BENCH WARRANT ISSUED

02/06/2020 - E-BENCH WARRANT ISSUED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- BENCH WARRANT ORDERED

02/05/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD- BENCH WARRANT ORDERED

NOTICE TO APPEAR

01/22/2020 - NOTICE TO APPEAR

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Hearing03/20/2020 at 08:30AM - MOTION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: PLEADED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET - REFERRED TO THE DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL RECOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketREPRESENTED BY MICHAEL DAVIDS, ASSISTANT PUBLIC DEFENDER STATE REPRESENTED BY ROBERT GAIL PLED NOLO CONTENDERE, ADJUDGED GUILTY SENTENCED TO 20 DAYS COUNTY JAIL WITH CREDIT TIME SERVED IN COUNTY JAIL MONETARY OBLIGATIONS ORDERED JUDGE RENEE INMAN ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present with Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( BOND HEARING 03/20/2020 8:30 AM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS~INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED-SEE CASE #20CF525A FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBENCH WARRANT FILED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-BENCH WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Hearing02/05/2020 at 08:25AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: FAILURE TO APPEAR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD- BENCH WARRANT ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT NOT PRESENT BENCH WARRANT ORDERED BOND SET AT $500.00 BOND ESTREATURE ORDERED/ROR/SROR REVOKED JUDGE HEATHER DOYLE ENTERED VIA ICPS SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDefendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.13b; Description: PETIT THEFT AFTER PRIOR CONVICTION; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less