This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 10/26/2020 at 12:31:21 (UTC).

DAMEON JASAUN BRYDSON

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 DAMEON JASAUN BRYDSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILBERT A SMITH JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********98AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILBERT A SMITH JR

 

Party Details

Defendants

DAMEON JASAUN BRYDSON

Bradenton, FL 34207

DAMEON JASHAUN BRYDSON

Bradenton, FL 34207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

KIERA FORLENZA

COLLEEN M GLENN

Other Attorneys

CHARLIE MARIE LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO TRANSPORT DEFENDANT

10/23/2020 - ORDER TO TRANSPORT DEFENDANT

MOTION TO INCUR COSTS FOR PRIVATE INVESTIGATOR

10/21/2020 - MOTION TO INCUR COSTS FOR PRIVATE INVESTIGATOR

MOTION TO TRANSPORT INMATE FOR TRIAL TESTIMONY

10/20/2020 - MOTION TO TRANSPORT INMATE FOR TRIAL TESTIMONY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/19/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY/DENIAL, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED BY COLLEEN GLENN, ESQUIRE

10/19/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY/DENIAL, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED BY COLLEEN GLENN, ESQUIRE

ORDER GRANTING REGIONAL COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGISTRY ATTORNEY IN CRIMINAL CASE - COLLEEN GLENN IS APPOINTED AS ATTORNEY

10/16/2020 - ORDER GRANTING REGIONAL COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGISTRY ATTORNEY IN CRIMINAL CASE - COLLEEN GLENN IS APPOINTED AS ATTORNEY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 12/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM 6-A

10/14/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD CASE MANAGEMENT ON 12/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM 6-A

REGIONAL COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEY

10/14/2020 - REGIONAL COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF PRIVATE ATTORNEY

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

10/13/2020 - ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

10/08/2020 - PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOW SET FOR 10/14/2020 @ 130PM COURTROOM 6-A

10/02/2020 - ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOW SET FOR 10/14/2020 @ 130PM COURTROOM 6-A

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER IS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

09/08/2020 - ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER IS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

09/30/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION

09/25/2020 - INFORMATION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

09/25/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

VICTIM RIGHTS PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION REQUEST (2)

09/25/2020 - VICTIM RIGHTS PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION REQUEST (2)

FIRST APPEARANCE RECORD (SARASOTA COUNTY SHERIFF)

09/25/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE RECORD (SARASOTA COUNTY SHERIFF)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • Hearing12/02/2020 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSPORT DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INCUR COSTS FOR PRIVATE INVESTIGATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSPORT INMATE FOR TRIAL TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OCTOBER 26, 2020 THROUGH NOVEMBER 2, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY/DENIAL, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED BY COLLEEN GLENN, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REGIONAL COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING REGISTRY ATTORNEY IN CRIMINAL CASE - COLLEEN GLENN IS APPOINTED AS ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Hearing10/14/2020 at 01:30PM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: SMITH, GILBERT A JR; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVICTIM RIGHTS PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION REQUEST (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE RECORD (SARASOTA COUNTY SHERIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER IS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 790.15.1; Description: DISCHARGING FIREARM IN PUBLIC; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 790.19.; Description: SHOOTING AT OR THROWING A DEADLY MISSILE AT, WITHIN OR INTO A BUILDING OR VEHICLE; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 790.19.; Description: SHOOTING AT OR THROWING A DEADLY MISSILE AT, WITHIN OR INTO A BUILDING OR VEHICLE; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 790.23.1a; Description: POSSESSION OF A FIREARM BY A CONVICTED FELON; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.021.1a; Description: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT WITH A WEAPON; Degree: Third Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.045.1a1; Description: AGGRAVATED BATTERY (WITH GREAT BODILY HARM OR A DEADLY WEAPON); Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less