This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/27/2022 at 18:02:42 (UTC).

DAISY GULSBY

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 DAISY GULSBY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE and FREDERICK P MERCURIO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********63AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

FREDERICK P MERCURIO

 

Party Details

Defendant

DAISY GULSBY

Bradenton, FL 34212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MARIA T CHUQUIZUTA CLARKE

RICK EUGENE FILKINS III

Other Attorneys

BARTHOLOMEW GALLAGHER STODDARD

ANDREW RICHARD VANSICKLE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

09/24/2021 - CERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

09/01/2021 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

08/26/2021 - E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

08/31/2021 - PRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

BIG JOHNSON BAIL BONDS;USFIC;$100,000,$100,000

09/01/2021 - BIG JOHNSON BAIL BONDS;USFIC;$100,000,$100,000

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

08/31/2021 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

08/26/2021 - AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

ARREST WARRANT - SERVED

08/31/2021 - ARREST WARRANT - SERVED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

09/08/2021 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • Hearing03/30/2022 at 09:30AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: WHYTE, STEPHEN MATHEW; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION (MAILED TO BIG JOHNSON BAIL BONDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event CRCM on 3/30/2022 0930 AM Judge STEPHEN WHYTE results CANCELLED on 2/2/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Hearing12/22/2021 at 09:30AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: WHYTE, STEPHEN MATHEW; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARARANCE RECORD- SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 3/30/2022 AT 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event CRCM on 12/22/2021 0930 AM Judge STEPHEN WHYTE results CONTINUED on 12/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEvent CRCM scheduled on 3/30/2022 at 0930 AM, JC - Judge STEPHEN WHYTE presiding. EventID 1387664

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:55AM - ARRAIGNMENT (CHARGED DEFENDANTS); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: WHYTE, STEPHEN MATHEW; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES CRITERIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CF002363CFAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • ChargeStatus: 812.014.; Description: GRAND THEFT FIRST DEGREE ($100,000 OR MORE); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • ChargeStatus: 817.034.4a1; Description: SCHEME TO DEFRAUD ($50,000 OR MORE); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW RICHARD VANSICKLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STODDARD, BARTHOLOMEW