This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:30:31 (UTC).

BRIAN SMITH JR

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BRIAN SMITH JR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LON S AREND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********07AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LON S AREND

 

Party Details

Defendant

BRIAN SMITH JR

Sarasota, FL 34234

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS CHARLES FIELDING

Other Attorneys

TYLER MARCELLAS EGBERT

 

Court Documents

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

01/29/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

COMPLAINT FILED (3)

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT FILED (3)

PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

01/29/2020 - PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

INFORMATION

02/10/2020 - INFORMATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/30/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ARREST WARRANT (3)

01/22/2020 - ARREST WARRANT (3)

ARREST WARRANT - SERVED

01/29/2020 - ARREST WARRANT - SERVED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/29/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/30/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • Hearing02/21/2020 at 09:00AM - ARRAIGNMENT (NOT FILED ON); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: AREND, LON S; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Hearing02/21/2020 at 08:55AM - ARRAIGNMENT (CHARGED DEFENDANTS); Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 2-A; Judge: AREND, LON S;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket***INFORMATION DEPOSITED WITH CLERK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS WITH ATTACHED REVIEW OF MOTOR VEHICLE AND PROPERTY RECORDS -INDIGENT CRIMINAL DEFENSE COST ASSESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED (3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT (3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 893.1351.2; Description: POSSESSION FOR TRAFFICKING IN, OR SALE OR MANUFACTURE OF A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 893.13.1a1; Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITH INTENT TO SELL OR DELIVER; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • ChargeStatus: 893.13.1a1; Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITH INTENT TO SELL OR DELIVER; Degree: Second Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less