This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 12:30:59 (UTC).

BRENTEN C BEARDEN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 BRENTEN C BEARDEN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********21AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Defendant

BRENTEN C BEARDEN

Palmetto, FL 34221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOSHUA CRAIG MILLER

 

Court Documents

INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

01/17/2020 - INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

01/14/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

01/13/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

01/13/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

01/13/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - !.7 VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

01/13/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - !.7 VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE AFFIDAVIT - IFR - ATTACHMENT

01/13/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE AFFIDAVIT - IFR - ATTACHMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • Hearing02/10/2020 at 08:30AM - MISDEMEANOR ARRAIGNMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: FARRANCE, ROBERT A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER (COURT APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER - IF QUALIFIED BY CLERK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE - VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE AFFIDAVIT - IFR - ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE-SIMPLE (DOMESTIC); Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less