This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/22/2023 at 06:05:48 (UTC).

BRENDA LEE JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 BRENDA LEE JOHNSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********84AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Defendant

BRENDA LEE JOHNSON

Bradenton, FL 34203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JULIUS HOBBS JR

Other Attorneys

TYLER MARCELLAS EGBERT

 

Court Documents

E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

03/25/2022 - E-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

03/25/2022 - AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

03/28/2022 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

BAD BOY BAIL BONDS, ACC, $7,500.00

03/28/2022 - BAD BOY BAIL BONDS, ACC, $7,500.00

INFORMATION

04/06/2022 - INFORMATION

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

04/26/2022 - STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODE SCORESHEET

10/12/2022 - CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODE SCORESHEET

JUDGMENT FILED - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

10/25/2022 - JUDGMENT FILED - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

ORDER OF PROBATION

10/31/2022 - ORDER OF PROBATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type ADJ GUILTY-PROBATION was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 11/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-A; Judge: WHYTE, STEPHEN MATHEW; Result: PLEADED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCOST WORKSHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 5 assessed at sum $200.00 AssessmentID 11978797

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $100.00 AssessmentID 11978796

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $100.00 AssessmentID 11978795

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance Pay Fine has been created with due date of 10/13/2022 - id number 2444717

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $418.00 AssessmentID 11978792

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event CRARRNFO on 4/22/2022 0900 AM Judge FREDERICK MERCURIO results RESCHEDULED on 4/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT -SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAD BOY BAIL BONDS, ACC, $7,500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEvent CRARRNFO scheduled on 4/22/2022 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge FREDERICK MERCURIO presiding. EventID 1415455

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ARREST WARRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-ARREST WARRANT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CF000784CFAXMA Filed with Clerk on 3/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • ChargeStatus: 825.103.3B; Description: EXPLOITATION OF AN ELDERLY PERSON OR DISABLED ADULT ($10,000 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $50,000); Degree: Second Degree

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less