This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 14:10:55 (UTC).

ASHLEY R TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 ASHLEY R TAYLOR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********41AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Defendant

ASHLEY R TAYLOR

Parrish, FL 34219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DAMIEN JOSEPH BYTHROW

Other Attorneys

GREGORY T HREBINKO

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 09/22/2020 AT 01:30 PM

07/01/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 09/22/2020 AT 01:30 PM

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

04/28/2020 - NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

03/31/2020 - INSTRUCTIONS FOR RELEASE TO THE MANATEE COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM

BOND REDUCTION AND/OR SUPERVISED RELEASE ORDER

03/24/2020 - BOND REDUCTION AND/OR SUPERVISED RELEASE ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING (BOND HEARING 03/24/2020 2:00 PM)

03/20/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING (BOND HEARING 03/24/2020 2:00 PM)

MOTION FOR A REASONABLE FORM OF PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

03/20/2020 - MOTION FOR A REASONABLE FORM OF PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

03/10/2020 - STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING ON 04/08/2020 AT 1:00 PM

03/09/2020 - COURT APPEARANCE RECORD: VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING ON 04/08/2020 AT 1:00 PM

INFORMATION

03/06/2020 - INFORMATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

02/07/2020 - PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

02/06/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

02/05/2020 - DEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

02/05/2020 - PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

02/05/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

02/04/2020 - PRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

02/04/2020 - FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

02/04/2020 - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

02/04/2020 - PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • Hearing09/22/2020 at 01:30PM - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Hearing07/01/2020 at 01:00PM - VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - SET PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 09/22/2020 AT 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDefendant Present with Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketORDER ON VOP COURT APPEARANCE SET FOR JULY 1, 2020..SEE CASE 2008MM002843AX FOR IMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Hearing05/06/2020 at 01:00PM - VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: INMAN, RENEE; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Hearing04/08/2020 at 01:00PM - VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-C; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE - PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISORY SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • ChargeStatus: 784.03.1a; Description: BATTERY; Degree: First Degree;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RELEASE SERVICES REASON(S) FOR NON-SCREENING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANATEE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less