Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Liberty County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:36:09 (UTC).

W.S. BADCOCK CORPORATION VS HUNTLEY, JANNA

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 W S BADCOCK CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUNTLEY, JANNA. This case was filed in Liberty County Courts, Liberty County Courthouse located in Liberty, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HOSFORD, KENNETH L, HOSFORD, KENNETH LAMAR and KENNETH HOSFORD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Liberty County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Liberty County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Liberty, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HOSFORD, KENNETH L

HOSFORD, KENNETH LAMAR

KENNETH HOSFORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W.S. BADCOCK CORPORATION

Defendant

HUNTLEY, JANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIDD, EVAN D

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE (3/23/21)

03/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE (3/23/21)

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

03/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS REQUESTED

03/02/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/02/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/10/2021 09:00; Judge: HOSFORD, KENNETH L; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (3/23/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 4/10/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge KENNETH HOSFORD presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 392021SC000007SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WS BADCOCK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIDD, EVAN D