This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 12:10:05 (UTC).

YORK, BARBARA M vs MACEDO, AMANDA

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 YORK, BARBARA M filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MACEDO, AMANDA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1458

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANTHONY MILLER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YORK, BARBARA M

Tallahassee, FL 32310

Respondent

MACEDO, AMANDA

Tallahassee, FL 32305

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • DispositionDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Action Description: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 6/29/2020; Judge: HOBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING; Start: 1:00 PM; Location: 1B; Judge: DVJUDGE; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO MACEDO, AMANDA RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 DR 001458, YORK, BARBARA M VS MACEDO, AMANDA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: ODP-7/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO YORK, BARBARA M RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 DR 001458, YORK, BARBARA M VS MACEDO, AMANDA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: ODP-7/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketORDER DENYING PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-RESPONDENTS INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO YORK, BARBARA M RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 DR 001458, YORK, BARBARA M VS MACEDO, AMANDA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: ORSI-6/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING INJUNCTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketINJUNCTION CHECK LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING SET FOR 07/09/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 1B, JDG: DVJUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketINJUNCTION INSTRUCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketRELATED CASE INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketJUDGE MILLER, ANTHONY B: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION ON RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less