This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/30/2020 at 13:21:27 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB vs LUCAS, LELA S

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LUCAS, LELA S. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN COOPER and TERRY LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1897

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN COOPER

TERRY LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

1505 N Florida Ave2922795

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

COXWELL, GLENN FLETCHER

Tallahassee, FL 32309

BOYD AND DURANT P L

Tallahassee, FL 32308

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 3

Tallahassee, FL 32312

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 2

Tallahassee, FL 32312

MCBRIDE ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

2751 Whitmore Ct2922797

Tallahassee, FL 32312

LUCAS, LELA S

Tallahassee, FL 32312

SUNTRUST BANK

C/O Legal Dept 40 Technology Pkwy South 2929190

Norcross, GA 30092

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • DispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 12/14/2018; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Start: 11:00 AM; Location: 100; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 8/20/2018; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Start: 11:00 AM; Location: 100; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 11:30 AM; Location: 301C; Judge: LEWIS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DispositionNON JURY TRIAL; Action Description: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL VALUE OF CLAIM IS $250,000 OR MORE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 9/14/2017; Judge: LEWIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant