This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/26/2020 at 14:12:00 (UTC).

WEST 10 vs BAKER, DEJANAE

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 WEST 10 filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BAKER, DEJANAE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0955

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST 10

Tallahassee, FL 32304

Defendant

BAKER, DEJANAE

Tallahassee, FL 32304

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

3/16/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/16/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED (TO SCHOENFELD)

3/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED (TO SCHOENFELD)

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1503078

3/17/2020: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1503078

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED

3/30/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

3/31/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • DispositionDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT NON-MONETARY; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 3/16/2020; Judge: RICHARDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1503078

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCOPIES MAILED TO TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TO SCHOENFELD)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketJUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less