This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/09/2023 at 12:03:20 (UTC).

WEAVER, BRYCE vs WARE, BARBARA K

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 WEAVER, BRYCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WARE, BARBARA K. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are J MARSH and J SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1077

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

J MARSH

J SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEAVER, BRYCE

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

WARE, BARBARA K

Tallahassee, FL 32309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM A KEMPNER

313 North Monroe Street, Suite 401 2813348

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorney

JENNIFER A SULLIVAN

305 South Gadsden Street, 3142032

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/6/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

11/17/2022: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES OF NON-PARTY DOCUMENTS

11/14/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES OF NON-PARTY DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

11/8/2022: NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

11/3/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

10/27/2022: DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF BRYCE WEAVER

10/27/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF BRYCE WEAVER

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/26/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

10/26/2022: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

10/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANTS AMENDED DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

10/17/2022: DEFENDANTS AMENDED DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

10/11/2022: DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/5/2022: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

9/29/2022: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

9/29/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/29/2022: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

9/26/2022: NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

9/14/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ANOD; Docket Text: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES OF NON-PARTY DOCUMENTS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQFC; Docket Text: NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CERT; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF BRYCE WEAVER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOME; Docket Text: NOTICE OF MEDIATION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-24; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1647403; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE SMITH, J LAYNE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 6/23/2022; Judge: MARSH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - INCORRECT DEFENDANT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEMPNER, WILLIAM ALBERT III