This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 01:05:03 (UTC).

WASHINGTON, TIKITA vs MYSTIC WOODS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 WASHINGTON, TIKITA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MYSTIC WOODS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0187

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WASHINGTON, TIKITA

Defendant

MYSTIC WOODS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/31/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

1/31/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

1/31/2023: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688860

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688860

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

2/1/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688860; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 1/31/2023 4:29:11 PM; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less