This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/24/2020 at 09:37:39 (UTC).

WARD, JOAN vs TALLAHASSEE RETAIL VENTURE LLC D/B/A THE CENTRE OF

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 WARD, JOAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TALLAHASSEE RETAIL VENTURE LLC D/B/A THE CENTRE OF. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANGELA DEMPSEY and KAREN GIEVERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0160

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANGELA DEMPSEY

KAREN GIEVERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARD, JOAN

Tallahassee,, FL 32312

Defendant

TALLAHASSEE RETAIL VENTURE LLC D/B/A THE CENTRE OF

2415 North Monroe Street 3011376

Tallahassee, FL 32303

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL; Start: 8:30 AM; Location: 365D; Judge: DEMPSEY; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • HearingEvent: JURY SELECTION; Start: 9:00 AM; Location: 365D; Judge: DEMPSEY; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIALS; Start: 8:30 AM; Location: 365D; Judge: DEMPSEY; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DispositionDISMISSED AFTER HEARING - OTHER; Action Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 1/23/2019; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Start: 8:15 AM; Location: 365D; Judge: GIEVERS; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Start: 9:00 AM; Location: 365D; Judge: GIEVERS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less