This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/20/2023 at 05:41:09 (UTC).

VICKERS, WENDY vs WARREN, CAROL

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 VICKERS, WENDY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WARREN, CAROL. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1074

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICKERS, WENDY

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

MICCOSUKEE HILLS APATMENTS, LLC

C/O Lisa Mcknight, Reg Agent, 310 Broward Street 3232431

Tallahassee, FL 32301

WARREN, CAROL

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY BLACKWELL

76 South Laura Street, Suite 1100 3198341

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorney

STEVEN M PURITZ

215 S Monroe Street, Second Floor 260069

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR COPIES

1/16/2023: REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

1/12/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION AND WAIVER OF OBJECTIONS IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351

1/12/2023: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION AND WAIVER OF OBJECTIONS IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR COPIES

1/12/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR COPIES

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

1/11/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

1/11/2023: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

PLAINTIFF, WENDY VICKERS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

1/4/2023: PLAINTIFF, WENDY VICKERS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL

1/4/2023: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

PLAINTIFF, WENDY VICKERS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, MICCOSUKEE HILLS APARTMENTS, LLC FIRST INTERROGATORIES

11/10/2022: PLAINTIFF, WENDY VICKERS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, MICCOSUKEE HILLS APARTMENTS, LLC FIRST INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

11/7/2022: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

11/7/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION AND WAIVER OF OBJECTIONS IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351

11/7/2022: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION AND WAIVER OF OBJECTIONS IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

10/25/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

10/25/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

10/12/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION AND WAIVER OF OBJECTIONS IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351

10/12/2022: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION AND WAIVER OF OBJECTIONS IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQFC; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR COPIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CERT; Docket Text: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION AND WAIVER OF OBJECTIONS IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR COPIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: PFS; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQFC; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RESP; Docket Text: PLAINTIFF, WENDY VICKERS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MTCD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 11:00 AM; Location: ZOOMC; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NTPR; Docket Text: NOTICE TO PRODUCE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACKWELL, GREGORY