This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Leon County on 04/24/2020 at 10:38:15 (UTC).

VAFEK, OSKAR vs THE SCHOOL OF ARTS AND SCIENCES FOUNDATION INC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 VAFEK, OSKAR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against THE SCHOOL OF ARTS AND SCIENCES FOUNDATION INC. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Leon County, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0313

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VAFEK, OSKAR

Tallahassee, FL 32317

V, K M

VAFEK, RUTH ELLEN

Tallahassee, FL 32317

Defendant

THE SCHOOL OF ARTS AND SCIENCES FOUNDATION INC

One Bala Plaza Suite 100 3014572

Philadelphia, PA 19004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN SIPPLE

Po Box 3912478925

Tallahassee, FL 32302

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND APPROVING SETTLEMENT ON BEHALF OF MINOR

2/20/2019: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND APPROVING SETTLEMENT ON BEHALF OF MINOR

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/19/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1402779

2/11/2019: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1402779

EXHIBIT

2/8/2019: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

2/8/2019: EXHIBIT

COMPLAINT

2/8/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/8/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 4:00 PM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: OTHER INSURANCE CLAIMS; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 2/8/2019 10:29:45 AM; Judge: COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPPLE, MARTIN