This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/24/2020 at 17:01:25 (UTC).

TAYLOR, APRIL vs DALE TADLOCK ROOFING TALLAHASSEE FL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 TAYLOR, APRIL filed an Other lawsuit against DALE TADLOCK ROOFING TALLAHASSEE FL. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1679

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR, APRIL

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

DALE TADLOCK ROOFING TALLAHASSEE FL

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY DAVID TILTON

150 S Monroe Street Suite 405 2969967

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON; Result: MOTION GRANTED; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 6/5/2019; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TILTON ESQ, ANTHONY D