This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/29/2023 at 18:18:00 (UTC).

TALTON, CRAIG vs ELITE CAMPUS MOVERS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 TALTON, CRAIG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELITE CAMPUS MOVERS LLC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1165

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TALTON, CRAIG

TALTON, CRAIG J

Defendants

ELITE CAMPUS MOVERS LLC

SPAN, JOHNNY MACK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

7/27/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

7/6/2022: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/1/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

6/22/2022: NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS

6/16/2022: PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS

PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS

6/16/2022: PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS

MEDIATION REPORT

6/15/2022: MEDIATION REPORT

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

6/2/2022: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

5/18/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS RE NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

5/13/2022: DEFENDANTS RE NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS RE NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

5/13/2022: DEFENDANTS RE NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF NEW EMAILS

5/13/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY AND DESIGNATION OF NEW EMAILS

ORDER GRANTING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE

2/17/2022: ORDER GRANTING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE

2/11/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE

DEFENDANTS RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

2/7/2022: DEFENDANTS RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

2/7/2022: DEFENDANTS RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

1/7/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

1/7/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT ADARYLL LEE on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT ADARYLL LEE on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT ALLENE NICHOLSON on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT PATRICK KNIGHT on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT PATRICK KNIGHT on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT JEFFREY LEAVITT on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT JEFFREY LEAVITT on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT IMANI WATERS on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT IMANI WATERS on 08/28/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Start: 11:00 AM; Location: Tele; Judge: DEMPSEY; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO CRAIG TALTON, JR.,; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS UNDER RULE 2.516; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-06; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1579360; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less