This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 07/06/2021 at 15:04:44 (UTC).

TALTON, CRAIG vs ELITE CAMPUS MOVERS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 TALTON, CRAIG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELITE CAMPUS MOVERS LLC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1165

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TALTON, CRAIG

Crawfordville, FL 32327

TALTON, CRAIG J

Crawfordville, FL 32327

Defendants

ELITE CAMPUS MOVERS LLC

813 E. Call Street, 3164135

Tallahassee, FL 32304

SPAN, JOHNNY MACK

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMANI JERE' WATERS

1030 E. Lafayette Street, Suite 6 3164138

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/30/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/30/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1579360

7/6/2021: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1579360

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1579360

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketJUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021 8:49:44 AM; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less