This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 06/04/2020 at 14:02:26 (UTC).

TALLY LAND LLC vs BROWN, MARQUITTA SHENIQUE

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 TALLY LAND LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BROWN, MARQUITTA SHENIQUE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUSTUS AIKENS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1096

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUSTUS AIKENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALLY LAND LLC

1701 N. 20Th Street Suite B 3094650

Tampa, FL 33605

Defendant

BROWN, MARQUITTA SHENIQUE

Tallahassee, FL 32310

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN CHRISTIAN CHASE

1701 North 20Th Street Suite B 2803602

Tampa, FL 33605

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

4/10/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

4/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1506676

4/13/2020: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1506676

EXHIBIT- LEASE

4/13/2020: EXHIBIT- LEASE

EXHIBIT- NOTICE

4/13/2020: EXHIBIT- NOTICE

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

4/20/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I POSSESSION - ISSUED AFTER REVIEW OF THE 20-94 AOSC

4/30/2020: MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I POSSESSION - ISSUED AFTER REVIEW OF THE 20-94 AOSC

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

4/30/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

4/30/2020: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5/6/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • DispositionDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT UP TO $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 4/10/2020; Judge: AIKENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO MANAGEMENT TEAM RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020 CC 001096, TALLY LAND LLC VS. BROWN, MARQUITTA SHENIQUE WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: MODEF-4/30/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I POSSESSION - ISSUED AFTER REVIEW OF THE 20-94 AOSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- LEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1506676

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketJUDGE AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tally Land LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHASE BRIAN C