This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 05:20:34 (UTC).

TALLAHASSEE HIGH ROAD LLC vs CONE, JIMMIE

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 TALLAHASSEE HIGH ROAD LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CONE, JIMMIE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3981

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALLAHASSEE HIGH ROAD, LLC

4241 Northlake Blvd Suite B, 3261918

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Defendants

CONE, JIMMIE

Tallahassee, FL 32304

CONE, JANISYA

Tallahassee, FL 32304

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN R MCCAIN

4241 Northlake Blvd, Suite B 2893609

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

11/28/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #1676829

11/28/2022: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #1676829

COPIES MAILED TO TENANT - J CONE

11/29/2022: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT - J CONE

COPIES MAILED TO TENANT - J CONE

11/29/2022: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT - J CONE

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED J CONE

12/2/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED J CONE

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED J CONE

12/2/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED J CONE

ANSWER - JANISYA CONE

12/7/2022: ANSWER - JANISYA CONE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT SIGNED BY CLERK AS AN ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT JANISYA CONE

12/9/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT SIGNED BY CLERK AS AN ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT JANISYA CONE

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

12/9/2022: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/9/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

1/20/2023: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AFNM; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MFFJ; Docket Text: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MODEU; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT SIGNED BY CLERK AS AN ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT JANISYA CONE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER - JANISYA CONE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED J CONE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED J CONE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT - J CONE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT - J CONE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: LANDLORD-TENANT RESIDENTIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 11/28/2022; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #1676829; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: LDTN_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT FILED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN