This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 08:27:17 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK vs THOMPSON, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMPSON, ROBERT. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1369

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

THOMPSON, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED (NOT ISSUED DUE TO COVID-19 INFORMATION)

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED (NOT ISSUED DUE TO COVID-19 INFORMATION)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

7/1/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579375

7/6/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579375

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/6/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

7/23/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

ORDER PERMITTING PARTIES/ATTORNEYS TO APPEAR REMOTELY

8/16/2021: ORDER PERMITTING PARTIES/ATTORNEYS TO APPEAR REMOTELY

COURT MINUTES

8/24/2021: COURT MINUTES

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

8/26/2021: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

9/13/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2021

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT KATHRYN HATHAWAY on 10/17/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2021

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT JESSICA FAGEN on 10/17/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DispositionDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Action Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $5,000 BUT NOT MORE THAN $8000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021 11:27:07 AM; Judge: RICHARDSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NVD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUGB; Docket Text: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021

HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: RICHARDSON; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: OGTH; Docket Text: ORDER PERMITTING PARTIES/ATTORNEYS TO APPEAR REMOTELY; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579375; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 08/24/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NCIF; Docket Text: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED (NOT ISSUED DUE TO COVID-19 INFORMATION); Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less