This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 02:17:06 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK vs DIXON, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 SYNCHRONY BANK filed an Other lawsuit against DIXON, THOMAS. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEFANIE NEWLIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0391

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEFANIE NEWLIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

DIXON, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD A RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/1/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

2/1/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/1/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1688965

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1688965

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

2/1/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-THOMAS DIXON

2/7/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-THOMAS DIXON

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

4/17/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT ISSUED 4/18/2023

4/17/2023: DEFAULT ISSUED 4/18/2023

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

4/17/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

4/20/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NCOC; Docket Text: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AFNM; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DEFT; Docket Text: DEFAULT ISSUED 4/18/2023; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MODEF; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-THOMAS DIXON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 2/1/2023 11:47:07 AM; Judge: NEWLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-02-01; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1688965; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE NEWLIN, STEFANIE M: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less