This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/30/2023 at 01:38:03 (UTC).

STONE, AMELIA vs COSTCO WHOLESALE

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 STONE, AMELIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J MARSH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0131

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J MARSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STONE, AMELIA

Defendant

COSTCO WHOLESALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

Defendant Attorney

KEVIN E JAKAB

 

Court Documents

PROTECTIVE ORDER

3/28/2023: PROTECTIVE ORDER

STIPULATED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

3/22/2023: STIPULATED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT

3/21/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-23

1/23/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-23

COMPLAINT

1/20/2023: COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

5/19/2023: DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/12/2023: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER SETTING JURY SELECTION, JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES

5/1/2023: ORDER SETTING JURY SELECTION, JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/28/2023: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

3/28/2023: DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

3/27/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION

3/24/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-COSCO WHOLESALE

3/23/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-COSCO WHOLESALE

DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

3/21/2023: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATIONS, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, AMELIA STONE

3/21/2023: DEFENDANT, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATIONS, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, AMELIA STONE

DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATIONS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, AMELIA STONE

3/21/2023: DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATIONS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, AMELIA STONE

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1687034

1/23/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1687034

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

1/20/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2024
  • HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL; Start: 9:00 AM; Location: 365D; Judge: MARSH; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2024
  • HearingEvent: JURY SELECTION; Start: 9:00 AM; Location: 365D; Judge: MARSH; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2024
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIALS; Start: 9:00 AM; Location: 365D; Judge: MARSH; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CERT; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Start: 10:15 AM; Location: ZOOMC; Judge: MARSH; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/22/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN 365D, JDG: MARSH, J LEE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: JURY SELECTION SET FOR 01/19/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN 365D, JDG: MARSH, J LEE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIALS SET FOR 01/04/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN 365D, JDG: MARSH, J LEE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: OSJT; Docket Text: ORDER SETTING JURY SELECTION, JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATIONS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, AMELIA STONE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 1/23/2023; Judge: MARSH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-23; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1687034; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE MARSH, J LEE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less