This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/29/2020 at 08:09:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA ON RELATION OF TCC AND DRA CRT vs DEPT OF MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Case Summary

On 05/03/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA ON RELATION OF TCC AND DRA CRT filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DEPT OF MANAGEMENT SERVICES. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN COOPER and CHARLES DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1006

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN COOPER

CHARLES DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TALLAHASSEE CORPORATE CENTER LLC

C/O Broad And Cassel Llp 215 S. Monroe St # 400 2965943

Tallahaseee, FL 32301

WILLIAMS, DERRICK

Tallahassee, FL 32301

STATE OF FLORIDA ON RELATION OF TCC AND DRA CRT

C/O Broad And Cassel, 215 S. Monroe St. #400 2978086

Tallahassee, FL 32301

DRA CRT TALLAHASSEE CENTER LLC

C/O Broad And Cassel, 215 S. Monroe St. #400 2978087

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

DEPT OF MANAGEMENT SERVICES

4050 Esplanade Way907074

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0950

Not Yet Classified

TALLAHASSEE RETAIL VENTURE, LLC

215 S. Monroe Street, 2Nd Floor 2972145

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: OTHER BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 5/3/2018; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 9:00 AM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIALS; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 2:00 PM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 3:30 PM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 3:15 PM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less